NY S05910 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 5910B
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 5910B
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires menstrual products in all public college and university buildings.
Title
Requires menstrual products in all public college and university buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5910B |
2024-03-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-03-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5910A |
2024-03-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2023-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A04060 (Same As) 2024-04-03 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES