NY A04139 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - substituted by s629a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - substituted by s629a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the community gardens task force to conduct an assessment of all community gardens located on publicly owned land in the state to facilitate each eligible garden's designation as a critical environmental area.
Title
Requires the community gardens task force to conduct an assessment of all community gardens located on publicly owned land in the state to facilitate each eligible garden's designation as a critical environmental area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s629a |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.223 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-22 | Assembly | print number 4139a |
2023-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S00629 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.66