NY A04302 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Workers' Compensation Board to biennially prepare and establish rate schedules for health care rendered under the workers' compensation system and to require the board to publish, within 30 days of enactment of this legislation, the existing schedule of rates.
Title
Relates to the establishment of rates of payment and delivery of health care services; directs the chair of the workers' compensation board to biennially prepare and establish a schedule of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-18 | tabled | |
2010-09-18 | vetoed memo.6800 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-25 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-25 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-25 | 3RD READING CAL.1217 | |
2010-06-25 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4631A | |
2010-06-08 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-06-08 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-08 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-07 | ordered to third reading rules cal.65 | |
2010-06-07 | rules report cal.65 | |
2010-06-07 | reported | |
2010-06-01 | amend and recommit to rules 4302a | |
2010-06-01 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-01-06 | referred to labor | |
2009-02-03 | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S4631 (Same As) 2010-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4302A