NY A04493 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a credit against income tax of fifty dollars and a deduction of any balance up to a total of five hundred dollars for expense of testing well water; applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2009.
Title
Provides a credit against income tax of fifty dollars and a deduction of any balance up to a total of five hundred dollars for expense of testing well water; applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2009.
Sponsors
Asm. Joel Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |