NY A04538 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Title
Relates to the cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.237 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.191 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a4538 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.832 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s5410 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.191 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05410 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.237