NY A04550 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To assist small manufacturers to seek niche markets.
Title
An act to amend the New York state urban development corporation act, in relation to creating niche market assistance projects to promote economic development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-18 | tabled | |
2010-09-18 | vetoed memo.6801 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-22 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-22 | 3RD READING CAL.1074 | |
2010-06-22 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3477 | |
2010-03-22 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2010-03-22 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-18 | advanced to third reading cal.738 | |
2010-03-16 | reported | |
2010-03-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-20 | committed to small business | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.336 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-09 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2009-03-09 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-09 | passed assembly | |
2009-02-26 | advanced to third reading cal.168 | |
2009-02-25 | reported | |
2009-02-10 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-02-04 | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S3477 (Same As) 2010-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4550