NY A04740 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a $100,000 real property tax exemption to conservation clubs and rod and gun clubs owning land acquired prior to January 1, 2017, having an assessed value of $500,000 or less.
Title
Grants a $100,000 real property tax exemption to conservation clubs and rod and gun clubs owning land acquired prior to January 1, 2017, having an assessed value of $500,000 or less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |