NY A04772 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-25 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-25 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the "city of Syracuse and the board of education of the city school district of the city of Syracuse cooperative school reconstruction act" in relation to the powers and duties of the joint schools construction board of the city of Syracuse and the city school district.
Title
Amends the "city of Syracuse and the board of education of the city school district of the city of Syracuse cooperative school reconstruction act" in relation to the powers and duties of the joint schools construction board of the city of Syracuse and the city school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-25 | Senate | approval memo.4 |
2013-10-25 | Senate | signed chap.459 |
2013-10-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.653 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3435C |
2013-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4772c |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.257 |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | print number 4772b |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | print number 4772a |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03435 (Same As) 2013-05-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4772C