NY A04801 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits fuel oil, grade number four in any building or facility in the state after July 1, 2028.
Title
Prohibits fuel oil, grade number four in any building or facility in the state after July 1, 2028.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | print number 4801a |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02994 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2994B