NY A04844 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - substituted by s3800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - substituted by s3800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the New York State Association for Retarded Children, Inc. to maintain bonds.
Title
Extends the authority of the New York State Association for Retarded Children, Inc. to maintain bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Assembly | substituted by s3800 |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.151 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03800 (Same As) 2013-05-07 - SIGNED CHAP.26