NY A04869 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful discriminatory practices; requires employers to make a conditional offer of employment before inquiring about any criminal convictions of a prospective employee.
Title
Relates to unlawful discriminatory practices; requires employers to make a conditional offer of employment before inquiring about any criminal convictions of a prospective employee.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03367 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS