NY A04892 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - print number 4892b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - print number 4892b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires children under the age of eighteen to wear protective headgear while skiing or snowboarding; imposes civil fines for violations thereof; applies safety in skiing code requirements to snowboarders and snowboarding.
Title
Requires children under the age of eighteen to wear protective headgear while skiing or snowboarding; imposes civil fines for violations thereof; applies safety in skiing code requirements to snowboarders and snowboarding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Assembly | print number 4892b |
2012-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | print number 4892a |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-02-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |