NY A04994 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Jefferson.
Title
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Jefferson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Assembly | signed chap.387 |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1133 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4384 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.234 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.234 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04384 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4994