NY A05040 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - print number 5040a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - print number 5040a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the payment of reimbursement where the insured has assigned his or her rights to an out-of-plan health care provider.
Title
Regulates the payment of reimbursement where the insured has assigned his or her rights to an out-of-plan health care provider.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Rory Lancman [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
Asm. Micah Kellner [D] | Sen. George Latimer [D] | Asm. Joan Millman [D] | Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Assembly | print number 5040a |
2012-02-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2011-02-10 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06565 (Same As) 2012-02-28 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE