NY A05059 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - print number 5059a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - print number 5059a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to intervention in school districts with chronic fiscal mismanagement and/or in chronic fiscal distress.
Title
Relates to intervention in school districts with chronic fiscal mismanagement and/or in chronic fiscal distress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Assembly | print number 5059a |
2016-03-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04217 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN