NY A05065 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - substituted by s3553a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - substituted by s3553a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the requirements in absentee ballot applications for village elections to conform to state board of election absentee ballot requirements.
Title
Provides for the requirements in absentee ballot applications for village elections to conform to state board of election absentee ballot requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s3553a |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5065a |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-27 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.225 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.103 |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03553 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.289