NY A05119 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - print number 5119a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - print number 5119a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to additional options for local social services districts to implement effective welfare-to-work programs; repeals certain provisions of such law relating thereto.
Title
Relates to additional options for local social services districts to implement effective welfare-to-work programs; repeals certain provisions of such law relating thereto.
Sponsors
Asm. Andrew Goodell [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Claudia Tenney [R] | Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] |
Asm. Marc Butler [R] | Asm. Christopher Friend [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Assembly | print number 5119a |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | held for consideration in social services |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01983 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to social services