NY A05159 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5159a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5159a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the joint commission on public ethics to develop and maintain an ethics training course for members and staff of the legislature; requires all members of the legislature to successfully complete the ethics training course on an annual basis.
Title
Requires the joint commission on public ethics to develop and maintain an ethics training course for members and staff of the legislature; requires all members of the legislature to successfully complete the ethics training course on an annual basis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 5159a |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03367 (Same As) 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3367A