NY A05176 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - advanced to third reading cal.247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the creation of a thirteen member advisory board within the department of agriculture and markets on food safety and inspection programs; such board is to advise, counsel and confer with the commissioner of agriculture and markets on matters dealing with enforcement of laws and regulations regarding food safety and protection and shall make recommendations regarding any necessary statutory or regulatory changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the creation of a thirteen member advisory board within the department of agriculture and markets on food safety and inspection programs; such board is to advise, counsel and confer with the commissioner of agriculture and markets on matters dealing with enforcement of laws and regulations regarding food safety and protection and shall make recommendations regarding any necessary statutory or regulatory changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.247
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S05387 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - referred to agriculture

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback