NY A05201 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Title
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Sponsors
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05212 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN