NY A05245 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the operation of games of chance by employees of authorized organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the operation of games of chance by employees of authorized organizations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-14Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering

Same As/Similar To

S04730 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback