NY A05251 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the provision of financing by the dormitory authority to the Gold Coast public library.
Title
Authorizes the provision of financing by the dormitory authority to the Gold Coast public library.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s459 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.344 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.344 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S00459 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.10