NY A05269 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-16)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - print number 5269a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - print number 5269a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class E felony of dissemination of false missing child information.
Title
Establishes the class E felony of dissemination of false missing child information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Assembly | print number 5269a |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02937 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - referred to codes