NY A05308 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to determination of state contribution for certain benefits provided pursuant to collective bargaining agreements.
Title
Relates to determination of state contribution for certain benefits provided pursuant to collective bargaining agreements.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. David DiPietro [R] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Alfred Graf [R] |
Asm. Claudia Tenney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03202 (Same As) 2016-01-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE