NY A05316 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.529 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.529 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03355 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means