NY A05490 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - print number 5490a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - print number 5490a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a program for financial transitional living services for foster children; establishes independent development savings accounts for foster children over the age of 16; requires foster children to attend financial literacy and independent living classes.
Title
Relates to establishing a program for financial transitional living services for foster children; establishes independent development savings accounts for foster children over the age of 16; requires foster children to attend financial literacy and independent living classes.
Sponsors
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] |
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Assembly | print number 5490a |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05421 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES