NY A05495 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory reporting of certain convictions, professional misconduct and/or employment termination; defines terms; further requires all licensees to report to the education department any conviction of a crime in any jurisdiction within thirty days after the entry of a judgment of conviction; authorizes the commissioner or deputy commissioner for the professions to issue a summary suspension order under certain circumstances; authorizes the district attorney to give written notice to the department of education upon the conviction of a felony or misdemeanor of any person holding a license pursuant to title eight of the education law; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires mandatory reporting of certain convictions, professional misconduct and/or employment termination; defines terms; further requires all licensees to report to the education department any conviction of a crime in any jurisdiction within thirty days after the entry of a judgment of conviction; authorizes the commissioner or deputy commissioner for the professions to issue a summary suspension order under certain circumstances; authorizes the district attorney to give written notice to the department of education upon the conviction of a felony or misdemeanor of any person holding a license pursuant to title eight of the education law; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.173 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.184 |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04780 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4780A