NY A05498 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hours, wages and supplements in contracts for public work.
Title
Relates to hours, wages and supplements in contracts for public work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.390 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.478 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.478 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 5498a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02975 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE