NY A05504 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for state reimbursement for lost tax revenue due to devaluation of land as a result of toxic contamination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for state reimbursement for lost tax revenue due to devaluation of land as a result of toxic contamination.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-19Assemblyheld for consideration in ways and means
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2011-02-22Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S02502 (Same As) 2012-05-02 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback