NY A05552 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.770
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.770
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an extension of time to the purchasing period for tenants to purchase a dwelling unit in a cooperative apartment building.
Title
Provides for an extension of time to the purchasing period for tenants to purchase a dwelling unit in a cooperative apartment building.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.770 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S00271 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
A05552 (Same As) 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.770
A05552 (Same As) 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.770