NY A05606 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that within a county that has established a traffic and parking violations agency and a liability is disposed of by such agency, eighty percent of such fine or penalty shall be paid to the thruway authority, and twenty percent of such fine or penalty shall be paid to the county in which the violation giving rise to the liability occurred; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that within a county that has established a traffic and parking violations agency and a liability is disposed of by such agency, eighty percent of such fine or penalty shall be paid to the thruway authority, and twenty percent of such fine or penalty shall be paid to the county in which the violation giving rise to the liability occurred; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.557 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1680 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5892 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.163 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.163 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05892 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5606