NY A05612 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - print number 5612a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - print number 5612a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Renee's Law"; directs the commissioner of children and family services to provide training to all employees of programs and facilities in which youth are placed or committed; grants access to office of children and family services' records, juvenile delinquency records, youthful offender records and juvenile offender records of youths placed or committed to a facility, to staff members and employees who are exposed to such youths and to foster parents who take custody of such person after his or her release; grants courts and attorneys access to such records in any proceeding for the commission of a crime while a youth is in the custody of the office of children and family services; prohibits the release, discharge or transfer of any youth who has engaged in criminal activity while in custody; requires the reporting to law enforcement authorities of criminal activity by a youth in the custody of the office of children and family services; requires a police officer to escort an employee sent to find a youth who is absent without authorization.
Title
Enacts "Renee's Law"; directs the commissioner of children and family services to provide training to all employees of programs and facilities in which youth are placed or committed; grants access to office of children and family services' records, juvenile delinquency records, youthful offender records and juvenile offender records of youths placed or committed to a facility, to staff members and employees who are exposed to such youths and to foster parents who take custody of such person after his or her release; grants courts and attorneys access to such records in any proceeding for the commission of a crime while a youth is in the custody of the office of children and family services; prohibits the release, discharge or transfer of any youth who has engaged in criminal activity while in custody; requires the reporting to law enforcement authorities of criminal activity by a youth in the custody of the office of children and family services; requires a police officer to escort an employee sent to find a youth who is absent without authorization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Assembly | print number 5612a |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S00555 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES