NY A05710 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.
Title
Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.
Sponsors
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Assembly | tabled |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | vetoed memo.89 |
2023-11-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1856 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7519 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.703 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.703 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07519 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5710