NY A05748 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - substituted by s4572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - substituted by s4572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period during which Cayuga County may impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Extends the period during which Cayuga County may impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Finch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s4572 |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.466 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04572 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - SIGNED CHAP.92