NY A05974 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds Prader-Willi to the definition of developmental disorder.
Title
Adds Prader-Willi to the definition of developmental disorder.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] |
Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.114 |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1041 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1219 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.529 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S01219 (Same As) 2017-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5974