NY A06020 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that providers of adult day health care and managed long term care plans may elect to use transportation management brokers; provides that programs of all-inclusive care for the elderly (PACE) are not required to use transportation management brokers.
Title
Establishes that providers of adult day health care and managed long term care plans may elect to use transportation management brokers; provides that programs of all-inclusive care for the elderly (PACE) are not required to use transportation management brokers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-11-01 | Assembly | print number 6020a |
2023-11-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04788 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE