NY S04788 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that transportation management brokers contracted with the department of health shall not have responsibility for services provided to enrollees of medicaid managed long term care plans or a Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE).
Title
Provides that transportation management brokers contracted with the department of health shall not have responsibility for services provided to enrollees of medicaid managed long term care plans or a Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06020 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means