NY A06082 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the inclusion of instruction in ethical business practices and recent legal matters in the continuing education requirements for real estate licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the inclusion of instruction in ethical business practices and recent legal matters in the continuing education requirements for real estate licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.306
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3839
2019-05-30SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.423
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03839 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6082

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback