NY A06091 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - substituted by s1732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - substituted by s1732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to student governments in secondary schools that have no districtwide or school building peer selected student government.
Title
Relates to student governments in secondary schools that have no districtwide or school building peer selected student government.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s1732 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.460 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01732 (Same As) 2023-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.357