NY A06241 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.326
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.326
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To allow Gibson Meeting Halls to apply to the Nassau County Assessor for retroactive real property exemptions on certain parcels.
Title
Authorizes Gibson Meeting Halls, Inc. to apply for real property tax exemptions on certain parcels in the county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.326 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-25 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-25 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-25 | 3RD READING CAL.1266 | |
2010-06-25 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6694B | |
2010-06-24 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-24 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-24 | ordered to third reading rules cal.325 | |
2010-06-24 | rules report cal.325 | |
2010-06-24 | reported | |
2010-06-24 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-06-14 | print number 6241c | |
2010-06-14 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | |
2010-06-09 | print number 6241b | |
2010-06-09 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | |
2010-04-20 | print number 6241a | |
2010-04-20 | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation | |
2010-01-06 | referred to real property taxation | |
2009-02-26 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06694 (Same As) 2010-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6241C