NY A06277 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - amended on third reading 6277a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to affordable housing corporation grants by increasing the amount that can be granted to a high cost project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to affordable housing corporation grants by increasing the amount that can be granted to a high cost project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading 6277a
2019-06-14Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14Senaterecalled from senate
2019-05-13SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2019-05-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.257
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-03-04Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S01824 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1824B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback