NY A06309 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 6309a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 6309a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the business income rate and expanding the small business subtraction modification.
Title
Relates to the business income rate and expanding the small business subtraction modification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Assembly | print number 6309a |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05954 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE