NY A06310 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - committed to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - committed to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the power plant tax assessment challenge reserve fund to prevent increases in the Northport-East Northport union free school district's real property tax levy and/or tax rate resulting from decreases in revenue or taxes or a significant shift in tax liability due to a tax certiorari settlement or judgment; defines terms; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes the power plant tax assessment challenge reserve fund to prevent increases in the Northport-East Northport union free school district's real property tax levy and/or tax rate resulting from decreases in revenue or taxes or a significant shift in tax liability due to a tax certiorari settlement or judgment; defines terms; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Keith Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Assembly | committed to education |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.181 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.718 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.718 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | print number 6310a |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07105 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION