NY A06324 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a county representation system for electing the governor and lieutenant-governor within the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a county representation system for electing the governor and lieutenant-governor within the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-05-23Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-05-21Assemblyprint number 6324a
2019-05-21Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-03-28Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-03-08Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-03-05Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S03877 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback