NY A06324 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - print number 6324a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - print number 6324a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to municipal corporations within counties having a population of between three hundred thirty-five thousand and three hundred forty thousand, or with a population of one million or more, according to the last decennial census.
Title
Relates to municipal corporations within counties having a population of between three hundred thirty-five thousand and three hundred forty thousand, or with a population of one million or more, according to the last decennial census.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Assembly | print number 6324a |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to aging |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S08870 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - REFERRED TO AGING