NY A06366 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state healthy and green procurement act".
Title
Enacts the "New York state healthy and green procurement act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.686 |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-19 | Assembly | committed to governmental operations |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.207 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.224 |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-04 | Assembly | print number 6366a |
2011-04-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |