NY A06400 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a direct support professional worker registry of persons who have successfully completed a direct support professional worker education or training program approved by the commissioner of mental health.
Title
Establishes a direct support professional worker registry of persons who have successfully completed a direct support professional worker education or training program approved by the commissioner of mental health.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. George Alvarez [D] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] |
Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D] | Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | print number 6400a |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to people with disabilities |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S05668 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO DISABILITIES