NY A06425 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4240a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4240a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to community and economic vitality, environment and energy, nutrition and healthy families and youth development under a form of organization and administration approved by Cornell university.
Title
Relates to community and economic vitality, environment and energy, nutrition and healthy families and youth development under a form of organization and administration approved by Cornell university.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4240a |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.653 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | print number 6425a |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04240 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.298