NY A06463 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the common council of the city of Albany, as the local legislative body, to establish the fee charged for issuance of birth and death records.
Title
Authorizes the common council of the city of Albany, as the local legislative body, to establish the fee charged for issuance of birth and death records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.293 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.531 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6463 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.755 |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s987 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.531 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00987 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.293