NY A06474 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes space on the business franchise and personal income tax forms to make a gift for home delivered meals for seniors; creates the senior wellness in nutrition fund.
Title
Establishes space on the business franchise and personal income tax forms to make a gift for home delivered meals for seniors; creates the senior wellness in nutrition fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6474b |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.245 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.130 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.130 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | print number 6474a |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07330 (Same As) 2016-04-15 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS